Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04055
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:Nov 15, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of America, National Association
1000 W. Temple Street CA9-705-05-19
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
20 20 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 11/15 7:38 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4055. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 11/15 7:40 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4055 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
19 19 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Thu 11/14 3:20 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Bank of America, N.A.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
18 18 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 10/24 2:20 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Bank of America, N.A.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
17 17 misc MNB Corporate ownership statement Reference: Fed. R. Bankr.Proc. 7007.1 Fri 08/02 2:00 PM
Corporate ownership statement filed by Bank of America, National Association.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 28, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/28 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 07/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
15 15 order MNB Scheduling order Fri 07/26 2:59 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Trial date set for 12/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
14 14 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 07/24 4:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/24/2019 10:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 14043 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:45 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 07/24 10:48 AM
Minutes re: (12 Order for status conference). Appearances by Andrew Stoebner for the Plaintiff and Jordan Weber for the Defendant. Scheduling order to be issued. (DavidT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 07/17 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 07/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
12 12 order MNB Order for status conference Mon 07/15 4:59 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 07/15 3:29 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Bank of America, National Association. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/06 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
9 9 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 06/03 4:16 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer to July 10, 2019. Related [+] (David T MNB)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Friday, May 31, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 05/31 12:56 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Bank of America, N.A.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: EXTENSION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 05/10 3:46 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Summons for adversary proceeding
6 6 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 05/10 10:12 AM
Summons re-issued on Bank of America, National Association Date Issued 5/10/2019, Answer Due 6/10/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
5 5 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Fri 04/19 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/17/2019 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 938 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:57 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 04/17 11:58 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff. Plaintiff to file a motion for Default Judgment.(Kristin)
Related: [-] 4 Order for scheduling conference
Monday, April 01, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Mon 04/01 12:56 PM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 10:00 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:52 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 12:53 PM
Summons issued on Bank of America, National Association Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 02/26 10:16 AM
Adversary case 19-04055 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Bank of America, National Association. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds