Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20225

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:19-ap-02025
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2019
Terminated:Apr 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Emerald O.V. Ltd., Defendant
102 South 200 East, Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Emerald O.V. Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
P2S, LLC, Defendant
102 South 200 East, Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
P2S, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Plant Performance Services LLC, Defendant
102 South 200 East, Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Plant Performance Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gil A Miller, Plaintiff
Rocky Mountain Advisory, LLC 215 South State Street, Suite 550
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Matthew M. Boley
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Friday, April 26, 2019
13 13 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Judge's Order) (order) Fri 04/26 10:02 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (ksh)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Fri 04/26 10:22 AM
Adversary Case 19-02025 Disposed. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
12 12 misc Pending Order Thu 04/25 11:11 AM
Pending Stipulated Order of Dismissal (Agreed to/Stipulated) Re:1 Complaint. (Boley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
11 11 notice Notice Mon 04/15 3:19 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum Filed by Gil A Miller. (Hansen, Kimberley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
10 10 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Fri 04/12 8:34 AM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Trial date set for 6/5/2019 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
9 9 audio Thu 04/11 6:30 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/10/2019 2:02:37 PM ]. File Size [ 9458 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:42 ]. (Status and Scheduling Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Wed 04/10 2:29 PM
Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. Appearances: Matthew Boley, Kimberley Hansen (Plan Administrator/Pltf); Joseph Shapiro (dft). Status of case discussed. The estimation cause of action is withdrawn on the record as moot. Court to prepare scheduling order. (mfr)
Related: [-] 8 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
8 8 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Tue 04/09 8:34 AM
Order Setting Status and Scheduling Conference. Status hearing to be held on 4/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court. (mkh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/02 12:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Emerald O.V. Ltd. P2S, LLC, Plant Performance Services LLC. (Shapiro, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
6 6 misc Pending Order Mon 04/01 5:09 PM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) Re:5 Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting. (Hansen, Kimberley)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (Form 35) Mon 04/01 5:07 PM
Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Gil A Miller. (Hansen, Kimberley)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/01 3:04 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Plant Performance Services LLC. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/01 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: P2S, LLC. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/01 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Emerald O.V. Ltd. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 2:35 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-02025 . Complaint by Gil A Miller against Emerald O.V. Ltd. P2S, LLC, Plant Performance Services LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment Not Due at this Time: Fee Waived Nature of Suit(s): [72 (Injunctive relief - other)]. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]