Mountain Crane Service, LLC
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joel T Marker |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-20225 |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Mountain Crane Service LLC, Debtor
393 S Monterey St
Salt Lake City, UT 84104 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:01 PM MDT |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
court
Dispose Adversary Case
Tue 07/02 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 23-02114 Disposed. (am) |