Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Terminated:Jun 19, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Security Control Systems, Inc.
12103 12th Avenue South
Burnsville, MN 55337
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
12 12 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 06/19 7:23 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4061. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 06/19 7:25 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4061 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
11 11 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Tue 06/18 3:05 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
10 10 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 05/20 2:35 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Security Control Systems, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/18 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
8 8 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 04/16 4:46 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint to May 15, 2019. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Monday, April 15, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 04/15 3:41 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Security Control Systems, Inc. and Martin C. Melang. (Melang, Martin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 04/15 3:18 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Security Control Systems, Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 13, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/14 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 04/11 8:39 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM., Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/08 11:48 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, March 07, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 03/07 9:38 AM
Summons issued on Security Control Systems, Inc. Date Issued 3/7/2019, Answer Due 4/8/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 03/06 3:21 PM
Adversary case 19-04061 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Security Control Systems, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds