Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Terminated:Jul 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Murlowski Properties, Inc.
2200 Old Hwy. 8
New Brighton, MN 55112
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 07/12 7:43 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4062. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 07/12 7:45 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4062 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
14 14 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Tue 07/09 2:53 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Murlowski Properties, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
13 13 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 06/03 12:13 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Murlowski Properties, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/24 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
11 11 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Wed 05/22 3:32 PM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
10 10 answer MNB Answer to complaint Tue 05/21 8:35 AM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Murlowski Properties, Inc.. (Bruggeman, Mychal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
8 8 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 05/07 6:02 PM
Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to Answer the Complaint to May 22, 2019. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
Monday, May 06, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 05/06 1:18 PM
Stipulation filed by Murlowski Properties, Inc. and Trustee John Stoebner. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to file answer(Bruggeman, Mychal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/04 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 04/02 4:45 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer the Complaint to May 8, 2019. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 11:14 AM
Stipulation filed by Murlowski Properties, Inc. and John Stoebner, Trustee. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to file answer(Bruggeman, Mychal)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/08 11:49 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, March 07, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 03/07 9:54 AM
Summons issued on Murlowski Properties, Inc. Date Issued 3/7/2019, Answer Due 4/8/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 03/06 3:26 PM
Adversary case 19-04062 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Murlowski Properties, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds