Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04063
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Terminated:Jul 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Premier General Contracting, Inc.
17671 76th Avenue North
Maple Grove, MN 55311
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
18 18 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
17 17 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 07/26 2:06 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Premier General Cotracting, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 07/26 2:37 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4063. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 07/26 2:39 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4063 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
16 16 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 06/28 1:20 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Premier General Contracting, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/07 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
14 14 order MNB Order for status conference Wed 06/05 3:26 PM
Order for settlement conference set for 6/18/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge William J. Fisher. (David T MNB)
Related: [-]
13 13 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 06/05 2:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/4/2019 1:30:00 PM ]. File Size [ 5123 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:40 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Tue 06/04 5:34 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for the Plaintiff. Garth Unke appeared for the Defendant. Order for settlement conference to be entered. (wmark)
Related: [-] 10 Order for status conference
Saturday, April 27, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/27 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/27/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/25 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 order MNB Order for status conference Thu 04/25 3:52 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
9 9 order MNB Scheduling order Tue 04/23 12:44 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 7/31/2019. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Trial date set for 9/4/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
8 8 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Fri 04/19 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/18/2019 9:20:00 AM ]. File Size [ 6795 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:43 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 04/11 8:58 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:20 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/10 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
5 5 court MNB Notice re: submission of paper documents Mon 04/08 10:38 AM
Notice to attorney re: submission of paper documents: (4 Answer to Complaint). (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 04/08 10:37 AM
Answer to complaint with demand for jury trial filed by Premier General Contracting, Inc. Proof of service. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/08 11:50 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, March 07, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 03/07 9:56 AM
Summons issued on Premier General Contracting, Inc. Date Issued 3/7/2019, Answer Due 4/8/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 03/06 3:32 PM
Adversary case 19-04063 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Premier General Contracting, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds