Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Jun 17, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kraemer Mining & Materials, Inc.
1020 Cliff Road West
Burnsville, MN 55337
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
7 7 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
6 6 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Mon 06/17 1:47 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 06/17 2:18 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4069. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 06/17 2:18 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4069 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 05/01 3:08 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Kraemer Mining & Materials, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 04/11 8:43 AM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:10 AM., Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 03/13 9:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, March 08, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 03/08 2:59 PM
Summons issued on Kraemer Mining & Materials, Inc. Date Issued 3/8/2019, Answer Due 4/8/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 03/08 2:08 PM
Adversary case 19-04069 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Kraemer Mining & Materials, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds