Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04070
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hass Hauling, Inc.
27894 Potassium Street NW
Isanti, MN 55040
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 12:58 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4070. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 1:02 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4070 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Mon 04/29 3:20 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Hass Hauling, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:09 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:14 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
5 5 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 04/01 11:26 AM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Hass Hauling, Inc.. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 03/13 9:35 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 03/12 2:15 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Hass Hauling, Inc. and Orin J. Kipp.. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 03/11 7:18 AM
Summons issued on Hass Hauling, Inc. Date Issued 3/11/2019, Answer Due 4/10/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 03/08 3:01 PM
Adversary case 19-04070 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Hass Hauling, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds