Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Jul 08, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Interstate Power Systems, Inc.
2901 East 78th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55425
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
10 10 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Mon 07/08 1:56 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Interstate Power Systems, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 07/08 2:07 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4071. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 07/08 2:10 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4071 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
9 9 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 05/20 2:33 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Interstate Power Systems, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
8 8 answer MNB Answer to complaint Wed 05/01 2:13 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Interstate Power Systems, Inc.. (Hainje, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 04/29 2:10 PM
Stipulation filed by Interstate Power Systems, Inc. and John R. Stoebner, Trustee for the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy estate of Midwest Asphalt Corporation. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Extension of Time to File Answer(Hainje, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/04 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 04/02 4:48 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer the Complaint to May 1, 2019. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 1:44 PM
Stipulation filed by Interstate Power Systems, Inc. and John R. Stoebner, Trustee for the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy estate of Midwest Asphalt Corporation. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Extension of Time to File Answer(Hainje, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 03/13 9:36 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 03/11 7:19 AM
Summons issued on Interstate Power Systems, Inc. Date Issued 3/11/2019, Answer Due 4/10/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 03/08 3:06 PM
Adversary case 19-04071 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Interstate Power Systems, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds