Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04072
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:May 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
G. L. Contracting, Inc.
4300 Willow Drive
Medina, MN 55340
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 05/10 10:26 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4072. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 05/10 10:48 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4072 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
8 8 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Thu 05/09 1:58 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/12 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 04/11 12:52 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and G.L. Contracting, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 04/09 2:24 PM
Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to May 20, 2019 Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 04/08 1:27 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and G.L. Contracting, Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 03/13 9:37 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 03/11 7:21 AM
Summons issued on G. L. Contracting, Inc. Date Issued 3/11/2019, Answer Due 4/10/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 03/08 3:11 PM
Adversary case 19-04072 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against G. L. Contracting, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds