Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04073
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Apr 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
J.D. Donovan, Inc.
P.O. Box 7368
St. Cloud, MN 56302
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 04/29 7:29 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4073. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 04/29 7:31 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4073 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
10 10 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 2:45 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/04 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/03/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:09 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:15 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
6 6 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 04/01 9:16 AM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint to May 10, 2019 Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Friday, March 29, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 03/29 10:03 AM
Stipulation filed by J.D. Donovan, Inc. and Plaintiff John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to file answer(Summers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 03/27 12:47 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by J.D. Donovan, Inc. and Patrick C. Summers.. (Summers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 03/13 9:38 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 03/11 7:23 AM
Summons issued on J.D. Donovan, Inc. Date Issued 3/11/2019, Answer Due 4/10/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 03/08 3:17 PM
Adversary case 19-04073 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against J.D. Donovan, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds