Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00017
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Terminated:Jul 24, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harden Farms Inc.
Harden Farms Inc. 746 Cooper Hill Road
Windsor, NC 27983
Represented By
Harden Farms Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/24 2:09 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-17 Closed (Bissette, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/22 3:19 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Harden Farms Inc. filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
8 8 order Extend Time Mon 05/13 12:03 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 6/13/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, May 09, 2019
7 7 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 05/09 11:40 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by W. Brock Mitchell on behalf of Harden Farms Inc. Related [+] (Mitchell, W.)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint,5 Motion to Extend
Monday, April 08, 2019
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 04/08 11:29 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 5/13/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, April 04, 2019
5 5 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 04/04 2:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by W. Brock Mitchell on behalf of Harden Farms Inc.. (Mitchell, W.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 2:23 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by W. Brock Mitchell on behalf of Harden Farms Inc.. (Mitchell, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Tue 03/19 12:05 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 03/13 1:07 PM
Answer due by 04/11/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/12 12:10 PM
Summons Issued on Harden Farms Inc. Answer Due 04/11/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 12:10 PM
Adversary case 19-00017 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Harden Farms Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A