Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Bank, FSB
4315 South 2700 West
Salt Lake City, UT 84184
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
5 5 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 04/10 7:58 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4075. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 04/10 8:02 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4075 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
4 4 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Tue 04/09 3:05 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/15 3:02 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/12 8:26 AM
Summons issued on American Express Bank, FSB Date Issued 3/12/2019, Answer Due 4/11/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 03/11 2:34 PM
Adversary case 19-04075 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against American Express Bank, FSB. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds