Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04076
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Advanced Imaging Solutions, Inc.
6121 Baker Road, #110
Minnetonka, MN 55345
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Thu 07/25 7:34 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4076. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Thu 07/25 7:38 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4076 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
9 9 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Wed 07/24 3:09 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 06/28 1:22 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Advanced Imaging Solutions, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Withdrawal Fri 05/31 4:39 PM
Withdrawal Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Proof of service. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for default judgment
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
6 6 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Wed 05/08 3:16 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment. Hearing scheduled 6/4/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court MNB Public entry Wed 05/08 3:47 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ADVANCED IMAGING SOLUTIONS RE:1 Complaint (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
5 5 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 04/24 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/24/2019 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 526 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:06 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 04/24 9:59 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebener appeared for Plaintiff. Plaintiff to file a motion for default within 2 weeks. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 4 Order for scheduling conference
Friday, April 12, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Fri 04/12 10:57 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 09:30 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/15 3:03 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/12 8:58 AM
Summons issued on Advanced Imaging Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 3/12/2019, Answer Due 4/11/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 03/11 2:39 PM
Adversary case 19-04076 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Advanced Imaging Solutions, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds