Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hartman Companies, Inc.
8011 Bavaria Road
Victoria, MN 55386
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 04/29 7:23 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4079. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 04/29 7:28 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4079 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
9 9 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 2:43 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 14, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/14 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 04/12 5:23 PM
Order Extending Deadline To Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to May 20, 2019 Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Thursday, April 11, 2019
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 04/11 2:21 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Hartman Companies, Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:11 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:19 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/15 3:06 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/12 9:07 AM
Summons issued on Hartman Companies, Inc. Date Issued 3/12/2019, Answer Due 4/11/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 03/11 2:54 PM
Adversary case 19-04079 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Hartman Companies, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds