Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04080
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Safety Signs, Inc.
19784 Kenrick Avenue
Lakeville, MN 55044
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
5 5 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 04/12 8:28 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4080. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 04/12 8:29 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4080 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Thu 04/11 3:31 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/15 3:07 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/12 9:06 AM
Summons issued on Safety Signs, Inc. Date Issued 3/12/2019, Answer Due 4/11/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 03/11 2:59 PM
Adversary case 19-04080 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Safety Signs, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds