Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04084
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Sep 16, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kusske Construction Co., LLC
424 Chestnut Street, #204
Chaska, MN 55318
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
23 23 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 09/16 8:18 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4084. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 09/16 8:20 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4084 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
22 22 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 09/13 3:24 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Dougherty Molenda, Solfest, Hills & Bauer P.A.; and, Gregorson, Rosow, Johnson & Nilan, Ltd. Proposed order.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
21 21 misc MNB Withdrawal Fri 08/02 2:20 PM
Withdrawal Related [+] filed by GRANITE RE INC. (Gregerson, Daniel)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for summary judgment
Thursday, August 01, 2019
20 20 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 08/01 2:17 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Kusske Construction Co., Inc. and Granite Re, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
19 19 answer MNB Response Tue 07/30 4:45 PM
Response to18 Motion for summary judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Kusske Construction Co., LLC. Memorandum of law, Proof of service. (Topka, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
18 18 motion MNB Motion for summary judgment Mon 07/08 12:02 PM
Motion for summary judgment filed by 3rd Pty Defendant GRANITE RE INC. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 8/14/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Gregerson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
17 17 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 06/27 4:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2019 10:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 1634 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:24 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 06/26 10:46 AM
Minutes re: (15 ) Appearances by Andrew J. Stoebner for the Plaintiff; William M. Topka for Kusske Construction Co., LLC; and Daniel R. Gregerson for Granite Re Inc. (DavidT)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/14 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
15 15 order MNB Order for status conference Wed 06/12 4:22 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/31 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
13 13 order MNB Scheduling order Wed 05/29 12:21 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 8/15/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Trial date set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
12 12 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 05/15 12:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/15/2019 10:45:00 AM ]. File Size [ 3258 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:47 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 05/15 2:07 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared on behalf of John Stoebner, Trustee. William M. Topka appeared on behalf of Kusske Construction Co., LLC. Daniel R. Gregerson appeared on behalf of Granite Re Inc. Scheduling Order and Order for Trial to be entered. Discovery due in 60 days; motions due in August; trial to be held in September. (wmark)
Related: [-] 11 Order for scheduling conference
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
court MNB Public entry Tue 05/14 12:08 PM
HEARING RESCHEDULED - TO BE HELD AT MAY 15, 2019 AT 10:45 A.M. re:11 Order for scheduling conference (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
11 11 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Mon 05/06 11:52 AM
Amended Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer MNB Answer to third party complaint Mon 05/06 10:36 AM
Answer to third party complaint without demand for jury trial filed by GRANITE RE INC. Proof of service. (Gregerson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
9 9 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 04/24 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/24/2019 9:45:00 AM ]. File Size [ 1683 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:10 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 04/24 1:05 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Kusske Construction Co., LLC.(Topka, William)
Related: [-] 6 Third-party complaint,7 Summons for adversary proceeding
7 7 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 04/24 9:34 AM
Summons issued on GRANITE RE INC Date Issued 4/24/2019, Answer Due 5/24/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 04/24 9:58 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; William Topka appeared for Defendant. Scheduling conference to be set after the answer period expires in the 3rd party complaint. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 5 Order for scheduling conference
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
6 6 cmp MNB Third-party complaint Tue 04/23 3:43 PM
Third-party complaint filed by Kusske Construction Co., LLC against GRANITE RE INC. (Topka, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Fri 04/12 10:55 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 09:45 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Wed 04/10 2:02 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Kusske Construction Co., LLC. Proof of service. (Topka, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 15, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 03/15 3:10 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 03/12 9:14 AM
Summons issued on Kusske Construction Co., LLC Date Issued 3/12/2019, Answer Due 4/11/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 03/11 3:19 PM
Adversary case 19-04084 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Kusske Construction Co., LLC. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds