Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00020
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2019
Terminated:Jan 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
International Paper Company
6400 Poplar Ave
Memphis, TN 38197
Represented By
International Paper Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/28 12:01 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-20 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/27 1:31 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to International Paper Company filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/14 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 12/13/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
21 21 order Compromise Wed 12/11 3:40 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, October 31, 2019
20 20 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 10/31 3:42 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Approve Compromise With International Paper Company
19 19 misc Supplement to Filing Thu 10/31 3:25 PM
Supplement to Filing filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Approve Compromise With International Paper Company
18 18 motion Compromise Thu 10/31 3:23 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With International Paper Company filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 10/24 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/23/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, October 18, 2019
16 16 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 10/18 12:54 PM
Stipulated Order of Seventh Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond To Complaint. Answer Due by 11/29/2019 (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
15 15 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Fri 10/04 3:14 PM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 09/19 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/18/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, September 16, 2019
13 13 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 09/16 11:03 AM
Stipulated Order of Sixth Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond To Complaint. Answer Due by 10/14/2019 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 08/08 12:52 PM
Stipulated Order of Fifth Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond To Complaint. Defendant Answer Due By 9/13/2019. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 07/20 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 07/19/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 07/17 2:34 PM
Stipulated Order of Fourth Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond To Complaint. Defendant Answer Due by 08/14/2019. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 06/14 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/13/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
8 8 order Consent Order (No Motion) Tue 06/11 12:36 PM
Stipulated Order of Third Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond To Complaint. Defendant Answer Due by 7/15/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 06/01 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/31/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
6 6 order Consent Order (No Motion) Wed 05/29 10:32 AM
Stipulated Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Response to Complaint. Due by 6/14/2019 . (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 04/11 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/10/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 04/08 11:33 AM
Stipulated Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Response to Complaint. Due by 5/15/2019 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Mon 04/01 3:02 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Friday, March 15, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Fri 03/15 1:07 PM
Answer due by 04/15/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/14 4:04 PM
Summons Issued on International Paper Company Answer Due 04/15/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 4:04 PM
Adversary case 19-00020 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against International Paper Company (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D