California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:19-bk-12927
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Aug 16, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Flexogenix Group, Inc.
1000 S Hope St Ste 103
Los Angeles, CA 90015-4058
Represented By
Jeremy Faith
Margulies Faith LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 03/17/2019 5:00 PM PDT
Monday, March 18, 2019
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 03/18 6:38 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:19-bk-12927) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 48704431. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 38 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 03/18 6:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Flexogenix Group, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/1/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/1/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/1/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/1/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/1/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/1/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/1/2019. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/1/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/1/2019. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/1/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/1/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/1/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 04/1/2019. (Faith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]