Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-12927

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:21-ap-01052
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. dba Par Funding, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By
Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. dba Par Funding, a Delaware Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By
Monserrat Morales
Margulies Faith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation
Represented By
Monserrat Morales
Margulies Faith LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, April 06, 2023
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/06 7:59 AM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-1052 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (SF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
17 17 notice Notice Wed 04/05 5:57 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:21-ap-01052. Complaint by Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation against Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. dba Par Funding, a Delaware Corporation. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers Pursuant to U.S.C. §§ 548, 550; (2) Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 550 and 551; and (3) Disallowance of Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Plaintiff Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
16 16 misc Status report Tue 01/31 5:31 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
15 15 misc Status report Tue 09/27 2:15 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 15, 2022
14 14 misc Status report Fri 07/15 5:28 PM
Status report Plaintiff's Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 04/27 11:02 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/26/2022 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 12 Status report filed by Plaintiff Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Plaintiff Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
12 12 misc Status report Tue 04/12 4:10 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 27, 2022
11 11 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 01/27 1:13 PM
Hearing Held on January 25, 2022, status conference continued to April 26, 2022 at 10 a.m. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 (Fortier, Stacey
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
10 10 misc Status report Tue 01/11 6:21 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 11/02 5:45 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 28, 2021
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 10/28 4:13 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 7 Status report filed by Plaintiff Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Plaintiff Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
7 7 misc Status report Tue 08/03 5:01 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 03, 2021
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 06/03 10:17 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 08/17/2021 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1668 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation
Sunday, May 30, 2021
6 6 notice Notice Sun 05/30 4:46 PM
Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
5 5 misc Errata Wed 05/19 2:43 PM
Errata Notice of Errata Re: Plaintiff's Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 4 Status report
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
4 4 misc Status report Tue 05/18 5:15 PM
Status report Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiffs Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation Related [+]. (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
3 3 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 03/24 12:34 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Faith, Jeremy. (Faith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 03/19 11:23 AM
Summons Issued on Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. dba Par Funding, a Delaware Corporation Date Issued 3/19/2021, Answer Due 4/19/2021 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/1/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Plaintiff Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation
Thursday, March 18, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/18 8:15 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-01052. Complaint by Flexogenix Group, Inc., a California corporation, Flexogenix Oklahoma, P.C. an Oklahoma professional corporation against Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. dba Par Funding, a Delaware Corporation. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers Pursuant to U.S.C. §§ 548, 550; (2) Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 550 and 551; and (3) Disallowance of Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Morales, Monserrat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet