Hunter v. HCA, et al
Original Case: 1:17-cv-00060
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-04034 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 19, 2020 2:29 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE KIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DANIELLE IHLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DIEMEL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PATRICK WILLIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DON CAZEL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN HEMMERSMEIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
YASMEEN SIMONIAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JEFF STEPHENS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH HANCETT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DANN BYCK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VICKY MCCALL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CARLA TAYLOR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ED EHRENBERGER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BOARD OF TRUSTEES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MINDY BOEHM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN LINES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARK ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLUMBIA OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AKA Ogden Regional Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MOUNTAINSTAR HEALTHCARE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HCA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDWARD G. HUNTER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 18 2020
[10740878] Dismissed. Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Holmes, Bacharach and Eid, authoring judge. Mandate to issue. [19-4034] |
Docket last updated: 05/19/2020 2:29 AM MDT |
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
[10633407] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/15/2019. Docketing statement due 03/29/2019 for Edward G. Hunter. Transcript order form due 03/29/2019 for Edward G. Hunter. Notice of appearance due on 03/29/2019 for Mark Adams, Board of Trustees, Mindy Boehm, Dann Byck, Don Cazel, Columbia Ogden Regional Medical Center, John Diemel, Ed Ehrenberger, HCA, Keith Hancett, John Hemmersmeier, Edward G. Hunter, Danielle Ihler, Steve Kier, Brian Lines, Vicky McCall, MountainStar Healthcare, Yasmeen Simonian, Jeff Stephens, Carla Taylor and Patrick Willis. 19-4034 | ||
Att: 1 20 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |