Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:19-ap-00293
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2019
Terminated:Dec 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stefen Choy
Represented By
Stefen Choy
contact info
Defendant
Sunggie Choy
Represented By
Sunggie Choy
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries, Ltd.
Represented By
Jeffrey K. Paulsen
The Law Office Of William J. Factor, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak Park Avenue Realty, Ltd.
Represented By
Jeffrey K. Paulsen
The Law Office Of William J. Factor, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, December 18, 2020
30 30 court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/18 8:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-293 Closed . (Jernigan, Toni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
29 29 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/17 10:32 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey K. Paulsen on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries, Ltd., Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak Park Avenue Realty, Ltd.. (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
28 28 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 11/19 5:26 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 10:45 AM at Appear using Zoom for Government.. Signed on 11/19/2020. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, October 23, 2020
27 27 order Amended Order Approving Procedures Governing Avoidance Actions (17-9308, #1410) Fri 10/23 2:09 PM
An Amended Order Approving Procedures Governing Avoidance Actions has been entered in the Bankruptcy Case. The Amended Procedures Order shall apply to this case unless, within twenty-one (21) days, the Defendant files an objection in this case, which objection may only be based upon exceptional circumstances that establish good cause for why certain provisions of the Amended Procedures Order should not apply. See 17-09308 Mack Industries, Ltd. docket entry #1410 for details. (Gonzalez, Maribel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
26 26 order Confidentiality and Protective Order Applicable to Avoidance Proceedings Fri 10/23 10:01 AM
Confidentiality and Protective Order Applicable to Avoidance Proceedings. (Gonzalez, Maribel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
25 25 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 10/15 2:32 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 10:45 AM at Appear by Phone, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 10/15/2020. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 17, 2020
24 24 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 09/17 3:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:45 AM at Appear by Phone, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 09/17/2020. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 20, 2020
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 08/20 1:53 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:45 AM at Appear by Phone, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/20/2020. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, July 16, 2020
22 22 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 07/16 4:03 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/20/2020 at 10:45 AM at Appear by Phone, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/16/2020. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 18, 2020
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 06/18 4:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 06/18/2020. (Boyd, Shante)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 21, 2020
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 05/21 4:45 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/21/2020. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 16, 2020
19 19 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 04/16 4:38 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/16/2020. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 03/31 3:56 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/15/2020. (Boyd, Shante)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 03/18 4:38 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/15/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/18/2020. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
16 16 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 02/19 11:45 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/19/2020. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
15 15 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/15 1:09 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/15/2020. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 12/18 11:33 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 12/18/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/20 3:46 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 11/20/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/16 1:24 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 10/16/2019. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/21 3:08 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/21/2019. (Johnson, Carly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/17 2:52 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/21/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/17/2019. (Mahoney, Sarah)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 order Default Wed 07/17 2:52 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Related [+]. Signed on 07/17/2019. (Mahoney, Sarah)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 06/19 1:30 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/17/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 06/19/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, June 17, 2019
7 7 motion Default Mon 06/17 5:08 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Filed by Ariane Holtschlag on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries, Ltd., Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak Park Avenue Realty, Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 10:45 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Holtschlag, Ariane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/22 1:49 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/22/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 22, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/22 11:02 AM
Summons Service Executed on Stefen Choy, Sunggie Choy Related [+]. (Holtschlag, Ariane)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
5 5 14 pgs order Order Approving Procedures Governing Avoidance Actions (17-9308, #1070) Mon 04/22 3:45 PM
An Order Approving Procedures Governing Avoidance Actions has been entered in the Bankruptcy Case. The Procedures Order shall apply to this case unless, within twenty-one (21) days, the Defendant files an objection in this case, which objection may only be based upon exceptional circumstances that establish good cause for why certain provisions of the Procedures Order should not apply. See 17-09308 Mack Industries, Ltd. docket entry #1070 for details. (Galimba, April)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 03/21 6:19 AM
Receipt of Complaint 19-00293 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39337709. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/20 8:33 PM
Summons Issued on Stefen Choy Answer Due 04/19/2019; Sunggie Choy Answer Due 04/19/2019 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 8:33 PM
Adversary case 19-00293 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries, Ltd., Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak Park Avenue Realty, Ltd. against Stefen Choy, Sunggie Choy. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2019 at 10:45 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]