Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:19-ap-00570
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2019
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
James K. McClelland
Represented By
James K. McClelland
contact info
Defendant
Ann McClelland
Represented By
Ann McClelland
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Peterson
Chapter 7 Trustee Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Edward T Joyce
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Rowena T Parma
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 04, 2023
82 82 court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/04 6:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-570 Closed . (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 03, 2023
81 81 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Sun 12/03 7:45 PM
The Hearing Scheduled for December 12, 2023 is Stricken Related [+]. Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 30, 2023
80 80 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/30 12:39 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald Peterson. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
79 79 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 11/28 2:30 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 11/28/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint