Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:19-ap-00572
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2019
Terminated:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keith McClelland
12440 Country View Lane
Homer Glen, IL 60491
Represented By
Keith McClelland
contact info
Defendant
Mallory McClelland
12440 Country View Lane
Homer Glen, IL 60491
Represented By
Mallory McClelland
contact info
Defendant
KAM Management Services, Inc.
12440 Country View Lane
Homer Glen, IL 60491
Represented By
KAM Management Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Peterson
Chapter 7 Trustee Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Edward T Joyce
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Rowena T Parma
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Friday, December 01, 2023
85 85 court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/01 2:59 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-572 Closed . (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-]
84 84 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 12/01 1:51 PM
The Hearing Scheduled for December 12, 2023 is Stricken Related [+]. Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 30, 2023
83 83 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/30 12:42 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald Peterson. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
82 82 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 11/28 2:31 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 11/28/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint