Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:19-ap-00573
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2019
Terminated:Oct 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sharon A. Kotecki
14902A Drummond
Cedar Lake, IN 46356
Represented By
Sharon A. Kotecki
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Peterson
Chapter 7 Trustee Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Rowena T Parma
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Edward T Joyce
Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2019
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/04 5:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-573 Closed . (Hamilton, Annette)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 10/04 4:37 PM
Hearing Scheduled for October 30, 2019 is Stricken Related [+]. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 03, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/03 5:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd.. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 09/12 12:42 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/30/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 09/12/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
22 22 order Default Judgment Thu 09/12 12:42 PM
(E)Order Withdrawing Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 09/12/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, August 29, 2019
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 08/29 1:02 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/29/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 08/29 1:02 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/29/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 16 Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
19 19 misc Proposed Order Wed 08/28 3:12 PM
Proposed Order - Default Judgment Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd. Related [+]. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/17 2:29 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/17/2019. (Mahoney, Sarah)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/17 2:29 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/17/2019. (Mahoney, Sarah)
Related: [-] 16 Default Judgment
Thursday, July 11, 2019
16 16 motion Default Judgment Thu 07/11 5:20 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Edward T Joyce on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
15 15 order Default Thu 06/20 9:30 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Related [+]. Signed on 6/19/2019. (Williams, Daphne)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 06/19 1:29 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/17/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 06/19/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 13, 2019
13 13 motion Default Thu 06/13 2:25 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Filed by Edward T Joyce on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 6/19/2019 at 10:45 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Notice of Motion
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/22 1:50 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 10:45 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/22/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 28, 2019
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/28 6:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sharon A. Kotecki Related [+]. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-] 9 Alias Summons Issued
10 10 misc Appearance Thu 03/28 5:11 PM
Amended Appearance Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd.. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Alias Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/28 5:01 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Sharon A. Kotecki Answer Due 04/29/2019 (Admin)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Thu 03/28 5:01 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd. against Sharon A. Kotecki. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2019 at 10:45 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
7 7 misc Appearance Thu 03/28 4:57 PM
Amended Appearance Filed by Edward T Joyce on behalf of Ronald R Peterson as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack Industries Ltd.. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
6 6 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 03/25 4:32 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Docketed on Wrong Case Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 3 Appearance,5 Appearance
Friday, March 22, 2019
5 5 misc Appearance Fri 03/22 7:20 PM
Appearance Filed by Rowena T Parma on behalf of Ronald Peterson. (Parma, Rowena)
Related: [-]
4 4 crditcrd none Fri 03/22 7:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-00573 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39359630. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Appearance Fri 03/22 7:09 PM
Appearance Filed by Edward T Joyce on behalf of Ronald Peterson. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/22 7:08 PM
Summons Issued on Sharon A. Kotecki Answer Due 04/22/2019 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 7:08 PM
Adversary case 19-00573 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Ronald Peterson against Sharon A. Kotecki. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2019 at 10:45 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Joyce, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet