Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2019
Terminated:Apr 22, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jerry Thomas Jordan
11108 Jordan Road
Raleigh, NC 27603
Represented By
Jerry Thomas Jordan
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/22 2:32 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-26 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
utility Matter Removed from Calendar Mon 04/13 11:20 AM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing Other Compromise Allowed Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Hearing
Friday, April 10, 2020
16 16 order Compromise Fri 04/10 3:59 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, March 20, 2020
15 15 court Hearing Set (Motion) Fri 03/20 10:19 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve Compromise With Jerry Thomas Jordan filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Thursday, March 19, 2020
14 14 utility Calendar - Schedule Thu 03/19 12:23 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] ument no.11 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
13 13 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 01/14 3:05 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 1/24/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.11 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Monday, January 06, 2020
utility Calendar - Remove Mon 01/06 11:03 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - AP Settled Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.11 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Bircher, John) **Corrective Entry: Motion to Approve Compromise With Jerry Thomas Jordan filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee.** Modified on 12/27/2019 .
Monday, December 23, 2019
12 12 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Mon 12/23 10:01 AM
Certificate of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement -
11 11 motion Settlement Agreement Mon 12/23 8:43 AM
Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 07/15 8:21 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Can request mediation at a later date Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Scheduling Order
Friday, July 12, 2019
10 10 misc Rule 26(a) Disclosures Fri 07/12 5:19 PM
Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
9 9 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 06/12 1:26 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Scheduling Order
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/12 1:26 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 7/11/2019. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 8/5/2019. Discovery due: 10/3/2019. Mediation Notification due 7/11/2019. Amendment(s) due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2019. Trial date set for 1/22/2020 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
7 7 admis Pre-Conference Report Tue 05/28 5:31 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 6 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Friday, April 26, 2019
6 6 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Fri 04/26 4:19 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 5/28/2019. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Calendar - Schedule Fri 04/26 4:08 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/25 12:13 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Luther D. Starling on behalf of Jerry Thomas Jordan. (Starling, Luther)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Wed 04/17 3:50 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 03/27 1:07 PM
Answer due by 04/25/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/26 3:23 PM
Summons Issued on Jerry Thomas Jordan Answer Due 04/25/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 3:23 PM
Adversary case 19-00026 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Jerry Thomas Jordan (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]