Carickhoff v. Dexin Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10679
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10679
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50185 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dexin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee for the estate of Mad Catz, Inc.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 08/23 11:34 AM
Receipt Number 94055, def payment Fee Amount $350.00 (GM) |
||
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 11/07 1:17 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Root, Alan) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 11/07 2:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50185 Closed (GM) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time
Tue 08/06 4:20 PM
Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Enlarge the Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process in Adversary Proceedings Through and Including December 22, 2019 with Respect to the International Defendant Order Signed on 8/6/2019. (SH) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 08/06 10:56 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 08/02 4:02 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Fri 08/02 3:22 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Enlarging Time to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extend - Motion
Tue 06/25 1:03 PM
Motion to Extend // Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Enlarging the Time to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/31/2019. (Faris, S. Alexander) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 05/01 3:52 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander) Modified on 5/2/2019 (GM) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/27 3:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50185 KG) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 03/27 2:52 PM
Adversary case 19-50185 Complaint by David W. Carickhoff against Dexin Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/25/2019. (Root, Alan) |