New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:19-bk-72292
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Jan 07, 2020
Claims Deadline:Jul 01, 2019
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022

Debtor
Petland Discounts, Inc.
355 Crooked Hill Rd
Brentwood, NY 11717-1031
Represented By
Robert Kolodney
Kane Kessler PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Allan B. Mendelsohn
Allan B. Mendelsohn, LLP 38 New Street
Huntington, NY 11743
Represented By
Nico G. Pizzo
Rosen & Kantrow, PLLC
contact info
Rosen & Kantrow, PLLC
contact info
Alex E. Tsionis
Law Offices Of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC
contact info
Fred S Kantrow
Rosen & Kantrow, PLLC
contact info
Avrum J Rosen
Rosen & Kantrow, PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722
Represented By
Hailey Lara Kantrow
The Kantrow Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/07/2022 10:13 AM EST
Thursday, March 28, 2019
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 03/28 5:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8 19-72292 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17793051. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 127 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 03/28 5:38 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Robert Kolodney on behalf of Petland Discounts, Inc. (Kolodney, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/28/2019. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/28/2019. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/28/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/28/2019. Last day to file Section 521(i)(1) documents is 5/13/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 4/11/2019. (jaf)
Related: [-]