Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-72292

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:20-ap-08090
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2020
Terminated:Nov 04, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mars Fishcare North America Inc
Represented By
Mars Fishcare North America Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Allan B. Mendelsohn, as Trustee of the Estate of Petland Discounts, Inc.,
Represented By
Fred S Kantrow
Rosen & Kantrow, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/04 8:08 AM
Adversary Case 8:20-ap-8090 Closed (lkg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Mon 10/26 11:58 AM
Settled without hearing Related [+] Settled; 9019 order entered on 10/20/2020. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
12 12 order Compromise Controversy Tue 10/20 11:12 AM
Order to Compromise Controversy. The Trustee is hereby authorized to enter in to the Settlement Agreement as annexed to the Application. Related [+]. Signed on 10/20/2020. (lkg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff Allan B. Mendelsohn
Monday, October 19, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 10/20 12:55 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Fred Kantrow: Motion Granted; submit order (mtagle)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Allan B. Mendelsohn
Monday, September 21, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 09/21 5:33 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Nico G. Pizzo on behalf of Allan B. Mendelsohn Related [+] (Pizzo, Nico)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff Allan B. Mendelsohn
Friday, September 18, 2020
10 10 motion Compromise Controversy (Settle Adversary) Fri 09/18 3:31 PM
Motion to Compromise Controversy As against Defendant . Objections to be filed on 10/12/2020. Filed by Nico G. Pizzo on behalf of Allan B. Mendelsohn. Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Pizzo, Nico)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application to enter into proposed Settlement
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and Mutual General Release
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, August 24, 2020
9 9 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 08/24 10:07 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Move. The time for Defendant Mars Fishcare, North America, Inc. (the Defendant) to appear, respond, answer or otherwise move with respect to the Summons and Complaint in the above referenced adversary proceeding is extended through and including October 16, 2020. Related [+]. Signed on 8/24/2020. (lkg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Allan B. Mendelsohn,6 Extending Time to File Answer, Stipulation and Order, Scheduling Order,8 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Allan B. Mendelsohn
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 08/24 12:10 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 08/19 9:33 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Defendant's time to answer the Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Allan B. Mendelsohn. (Pizzo, Nico)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 07/28 12:49 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/24/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, July 24, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sat 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 07/24/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
6 6 order Extending Time to File Answer Wed 07/22 10:21 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Move. The time for Defendant Mars Fishcare, North America, Inc. to appear, respond, answer or otherwise move with respect to the Summons and Complaint is extended through and including August 19, 2020. The pretrial conference is adjourned to August 24, 2020 at 9:30 am. at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. Related [+]. Signed on 7/22/2020. (lkg)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Allan B. Mendelsohn
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Tue 07/21 9:11 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Defendant's time to answer the Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Allan B. Mendelsohn. (Pizzo, Nico)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 07/20 6:18 PM
[Attorney to re-file, please disregard] Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Defendant's time to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Allan B. Mendelsohn. (Pizzo, Nico) Modified on 7/21/2020 (lkg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/19 1:47 PM
Summons Served on Mars Fishcare North America Inc 6/19/2020 and these additional parties: United States Trustee . (Kantrow, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Fri 06/19 10:01 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Mars Fishcare North America Inc Answer Due: 7/20/2020 Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (lkg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/18 5:15 PM
Adversary case 8 20-08090 Complaint by Allan B. Mendelsohn against Mars Fishcare North America Inc. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Kantrow, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet