Sommers v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-32106
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-32106
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03371 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Illinois National Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Erin Energy Corporation
2800 Post Oak Blvd. 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Sunday, June 09, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Sun 06/09 6:29 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3371 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 06/06 3:36 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ronald J. Sommers (Fritz, Michael) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/06 3:35 PM
Stipulation By Ronald J. Sommers and Illinois National Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, and Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers ). (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 05/31 10:03 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Paul F. Matousek Signed on 5/31/2019. (LinhthuDo) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/31 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/30/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Generic Motion
Tue 05/28 1:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Join in Illinois National Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17) Signed on 5/28/2019. (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice
Fri 05/24 2:34 PM
Notice of Appearance of Robert S. Harrell . Filed by Illinois National Insurance Company (Harrell, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice
Thu 05/23 7:59 PM
Notice Trustee's Notice Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution . Filed by Ronald J. Sommers (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Withdrawal of Reference
Wed 05/15 10:13 AM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Fee Amount: $ 181. Filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Lemoine, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/15 10:15 AM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 19-03371 [motion,mwdref] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21131917. Fee amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Thu 05/09 12:13 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 AM. Appearances: Michael Fritz and Kyung Lee for Trustee Ronald Sommers, Robert Harold and Charles Kelley for Illinois National Insurance Company, Stephanie Lemoine for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Tony Draper for Federal Insurance Company. . Comments made by parties regarding ADR. Court Orders Trustee to file statement regarding the institution of ADR policy by May 23, 2019. Parties are to file response to Trustee's statement by June 6, 2019. Status Conference is continued to 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (kpico) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 05/09 10:01 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Paul F. Matousek . Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Draper, Tony) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/09 9:58 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Draper, Tony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/02 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/02 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
12
pgs
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Thu 05/02 5:32 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers ). (Lee, Kyung) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Statement
Wed 05/01 2:37 PM
Statement Federal Insurance Company's Corporate Ownership Statement (Filed By Federal Insurance Company ). (Draper, Tony) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Generic Motion
Wed 05/01 2:29 PM
Motion to Join in Illinois National Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17) Filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Vezey, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Statement
Tue 04/30 4:49 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership (Filed By Illinois National Insurance Company ). (Dinh, Cindy) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 04/30 8:29 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Signed on 4/30/2019. (dhan) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 04/30 8:23 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Signed on 4/30/2019. (dhan) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/29 6:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Illinois National Insurance Company (Kelley, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/29 5:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Stephanie Villagomez Lemoine . Filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Vezey, Bryan) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/29 5:38 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Michael Davisson . Filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Vezey, Bryan) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 5:33 PM
Statement Starr Indemnity & Liability Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Filed By Starr Indemnity & Liability Company ). (Vezey, Bryan) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Response
Mon 04/29 5:07 PM
Response Starr Indemnity & Liability Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judment . Filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Vezey, Bryan) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 3:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Draper, Tony) |
|
Sunday, April 28, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/28 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
motion
Extend Time
Fri 04/26 6:17 PM
Motion to Extend Time Trustee's Motion for Further Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Ronald J. Sommers (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time
Fri 04/26 3:05 PM
Order Granting Trustee's Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference, Signed on 4/26/2019 . (rcas) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate
Thu 04/18 4:05 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers ) (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
motion
Extend Time
Wed 04/17 8:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time toConduct Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Ronald J. Sommers (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Wed 04/10 8:32 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers ) (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/07 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order for Conference
Thu 04/04 2:56 PM
Order for Conference, Signed on 4/4/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Fri 03/29 5:25 PM
Summons Issued on Federal Insurance Company Date Issued 3/29/2019; Illinois National Insurance Company Date Issued 3/29/2019; Starr Indemnity & Liability Company Date Issued 3/29/2019. (hcar) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 03/28 4:18 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Illinois National Insurance Company; Federal Insurance Company; and Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Fritz, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 03/28 3:52 PM
Adversary case 19-03371 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Ronald J. Sommers against Illinois National Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Fee Amount $350 (Fritz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |