Erin Energy Corporation and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-32106 |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Converted: | Jul 13, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Erin Energy Corporation, Debtor
1330 Post Oak Blvd Ste 2250
Houston, TX 77056-3871 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Erin Energy Ltd.
1330 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 2250
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Erin Energy Kenya Limited
1330 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 2250
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Erin Petroleum Nigeria Limited
1330 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 2250
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Erin Energy Corporation
1330 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 2250
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:17 PM CST |
Attorney
James Scott Douglass
1811 Bering Dr., Suite 420
Houston, TX 77057 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Okin Adams LLP
Okin Adams LLP 1113 Vine St Suite 240
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oceaneering Services Nigeria Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Glencore Energy UK, Ltd.
1330 Post Oak Blvd., Ste. 2250
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77235 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Indigo Drilling Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
|
Creditor
JDR Cable Systems Limited
Staff Weems LLP 6363 Woodway Suite 1100
Houston, TX 77057 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mauritius Commercial Bank Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oltasho Nigeria Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific Bora Ltd
201 St. Charles Avenue Suite 5100
New Orleans, LA 70170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific International Drilling West Africa Ltd.
201 St. Charles Avenue Suite 5100
New Orleans, LA 70170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pasadena Insurance Agency, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Public Investment Corporation Soc. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Transocean Offshore Gulf of Guinea VII Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Unitech International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zenith Bank Plc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Four Oaks Place Operating, LP
Dabney Pappas 1776 Yorktown Suite 425
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Armada Oyo Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BDO USA, LLP
|
|
Creditor
Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
P O Box 4740
Houston, TX 77210 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lee P. Brown
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bumi Armada (Singapore) Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
William J. Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
FAR Gambia Ltd f/k/a Meridian Minerals (Mauritius) Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J. Kent Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Moyes & Co.
|
|
Financial Advisor
Stout Risius Ross, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Conway MacKenzie, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Gregory F. Holcombe
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Wuyi Ogunyinka
|
|
Trustee
Moyes & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Ronald J Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Blvd 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Trustee
Randy W Williams
Terminated: 07/13/2018
Byman & Associates PLLC 7924 Broadway Suite 104
Pearland, TX 77581 |
1. | Erin Energy files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (kallanishenergy.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/27/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 5:24 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/25 6:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-32106 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19974518. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Wed 04/25 5:39 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Erin Energy Corporation. (Okin, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Designation of Complex Case
Wed 04/25 7:25 PM
Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By Erin Energy Corporation ). (Okin, Matthew) |