Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00030
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2019
Terminated:Oct 02, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jerome Langdon
5855 Old Fairground Road
Benson, NC 27504
Represented By
Jerome Langdon
contact info
Defendant
Jerome Langdon Produce LLC
5855 Old Fairground Road
Benson, NC 27504
Represented By
Jerome Langdon Produce LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/02 12:48 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-30 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 09/20 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/19/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
21 21 order Default Judgment Tue 09/17 10:41 AM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC Related [+] (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
20 20 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 08/27 3:45 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Christopher Waivers. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 8/30/2019. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.17 Motion for Default Judgment as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Monday, August 26, 2019
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/26 12:26 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee. Related [+] (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.,18 Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, August 23, 2019
18 18 13 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Fri 08/23 8:36 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC
17 17 motion Default Judgment Fri 08/23 8:33 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 07/19 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 07/18/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
15 15 court Entry of Default Tue 07/16 1:38 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 14 Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, July 12, 2019
14 14 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/12 11:52 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
13 13 motion Entry of Default Tue 07/09 3:59 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
12 12 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Mon 06/17 1:02 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John Bircher. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The Affidavit of Service and the Motion for Entry of Default should be amended to include correct information (Neither Document References Summons Being Re-Issued And Complaint Being Amended). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 6/27/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.5 Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. (RE: related document(s)3 Amended Complaint). filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.,10 Motion for Entry of Default as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
11 11 order Dismiss Show Cause Order Wed 06/12 12:31 PM
Order Dismissing Show Cause Order Related [+]. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 9 Order to Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute
utility Calendar - Remove Wed 06/12 10:19 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - Other- Motion for Entry of Default Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. .
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
10 10 motion Entry of Default Tue 06/11 11:57 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Jerome Langdon Produce LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
9 9 order Show Cause (Failure to Prosecute) Mon 06/10 10:05 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause hearing to be held on 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
8 8 utility Calendar - Schedule Fri 06/07 7:17 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.6 Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer
Thursday, May 09, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 05/10 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/09/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
6 6 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Tue 05/07 9:24 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 5/29/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
5 5 misc Affidavit Mon 04/08 4:30 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
4 4 court Summons Reissued Tue 04/02 3:41 PM
Summons Reissued on Jerome Langdon Produce LLC Date Issued 4/2/2019, Answer Due 5/2/2019 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/02 12:55 PM
Amended Complaint against Jerome Langdon Produce LLC. filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Set Deadline (Private) Tue 04/02 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/01/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/01 5:31 PM
Summons Issued on Jerome Langdon Answer Due 05/1/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 5:31 PM
Adversary case 19-00030 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Jerome Langdon (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]