Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00031
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2019
Terminated:Mar 13, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Y&B Transport LLC
228 A Argelia Drive
Chaparral, NM 88081
Represented By
Y&B Transport LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 13, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/13 12:49 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-31 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 29, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 03/01 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/29/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, February 27, 2020
12 12 order Default Judgment Thu 02/27 3:52 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Y&B Transport LLC Related [+] (Wiggins, Carrie)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, February 13, 2020
11 11 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 02/13 11:10 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 2/24/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Y&B Transport LLC filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Friday, February 07, 2020
10 10 13 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Fri 02/07 4:56 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Y&B Transport LLC
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/07 4:54 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Y&B Transport LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 06/03 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/02/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 court Entry of Default Fri 05/31 9:24 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
6 6 motion Entry of Default Wed 05/29 5:21 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Y&B Transport LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 05/10 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/09/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Tue 05/07 9:23 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 5/29/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Mon 04/08 4:28 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Tue 04/02 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/01/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/01 5:39 PM
Summons Issued on Y&B Transport LLC Answer Due 05/1/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 5:39 PM
Adversary case 19-00031 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Y&B Transport LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]