Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03381
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2019
Terminated:Feb 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
SelectHeath, Inc.
Represented By
SelectHeath, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 08, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/08 9:01 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3381 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
35 35 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/05 1:04 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
34 34 notice Notice Thu 12/31 8:40 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement . Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
33 33 answer Reply Tue 12/22 5:35 PM
Reply In Support of its Related [+]. Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-] 29 Motion For Summary Judgment
Friday, December 18, 2020
32 32 answer Response Fri 12/18 12:54 PM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 29 Motion For Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Att: 14 Exhibit N
Att: 15 Exhibit O
Att: 16 Exhibit P
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
Att: 18 Exhibit R
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
31 31 misc Proposed Order Tue 12/08 8:39 AM
Proposed Order RE: SelectHealth, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed By SelectHealth, Inc. ) Related [+] (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-] 29 Motion For Summary Judgment
Monday, November 30, 2020
30 30 misc Certificate Mon 11/30 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By SelectHealth, Inc. ) Related [+] (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-] 29 Motion For Summary Judgment
Friday, November 27, 2020
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/27 4:03 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Monday, November 09, 2020
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 11/09 11:22 AM
Notice of Location. The pre-trial conference scheduled for 2/22/2021 will be held by telephone and video conference. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 19, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/19 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Friday, April 17, 2020
27 27 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Fri 04/17 10:14 AM
First Amended Comprehensive Scheduling, Pre-Trial and Trial Order Signed on 4/17/2020 Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 2/5/2021. Discovery due by 9/25/2020. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
26 26 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 04/16 3:55 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, November 24, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/24 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Friday, November 22, 2019
24 24 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Fri 11/22 11:19 AM
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 11/22/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 10/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/25/2020. (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Fri 11/22 11:19 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30 am. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero for Plaintiff. David Castleberry (by phone) for Defendant. Discovery deadlines given to parties on the record. Scheduling order to be issued. Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Monday, November 11, 2019
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/11 4:26 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, October 21, 2019
22 22 court Courtroom Minutes (CM) Mon 10/21 1:39 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 am. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero and Carolyn Carollo for Plaintiff. David Castleberry (by phone) for Defendant. Defendant counsel to amend answer by 11/12/19, hearing continue to 11/22/19 at 9:30 am. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Generic Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 10/07 2:11 PM
Order Granting Mark Shapiro, Trustee of Alliance Health Liquidating Trust's Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, October 03, 2019
19 19 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Thu 10/03 4:36 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
18 18 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 09/11 10:19 AM
Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 21, 2019
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 1:49 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 31, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/01 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/01 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
14 14 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/29 2:26 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Signed on 5/29/2019. (dhan) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019 (dhan)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/29 2:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Signed on 5/29/2019. (dhan)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, May 24, 2019
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/24 10:52 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for David C. Castleberry . Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/24 10:51 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Trevor J. Lee . Filed by SelectHealth, Inc. (Roberts, Alex)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 12, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Friday, May 10, 2019
9 9 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 2:37 PM
Order Extending Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Signed on 5/10/2019 (sgue)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 05/10 2:37 PM
SelectHealth, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 6/21/2019. (sgue)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 05/07 12:02 PM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. and SelectHealth, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/10 4:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on SelectHealth, Inc. 4/10/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 10:35 AM
Summons Issued on SelectHealth, Inc. Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 7:53 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on SelectHealth, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate Mon 04/08 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Saturday, April 06, 2019
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/07 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Thursday, April 04, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Thu 04/04 2:49 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 04/02 5:10 PM
Adversary case 19-03381 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against SelectHeath, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A