Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03385
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2019
Terminated:Oct 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bon Appetit Management Co.
Represented By
Bon Appetit Management Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 23, 2019
17 17 notice Notice Mon 12/23 1:38 PM
Notice of Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment . Related [+] Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
14 14 order Default Judgment Mon 10/07 4:12 PM
Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 10/07 2:38 PM
Order Granting Mark Shapiro, Trustee of Alliance Health Liquidating Trusts Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 11
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/07 4:13 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3385 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
12 12 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/13 10:30 AM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Issued Summons
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Executed Summons
Att: 4 Default Judgment
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
11 11 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 09/11 10:25 AM
Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, May 12, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Friday, May 10, 2019
9 9 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 3:52 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 5/10/2019 Related [+] (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Thursday, May 09, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/09 5:03 PM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. and Bon Appetit Management Co.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/10 4:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bon Appetit Management Co. 4/10/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
6 6 court Summons Issued Tue 04/09 12:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Bon Appetit Management Co. Date Issued 4/9/2019. (jdav)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
5 5 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 04/08 4:03 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Bon Appetit Management Co.. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Mon 04/08 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Saturday, April 06, 2019
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/07 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Thursday, April 04, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Thu 04/04 2:49 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 04/03 12:56 PM
Adversary case 19-03385 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against Bon Appetit Management Co.. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A