Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03386
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2019
Terminated:Aug 15, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Workers' Compensation Fund
Represented By
Workers' Compensation Fund
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/15 9:50 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3386 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/12 10:39 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Workers' Compensation Fund (Flores, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/14 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
Monday, June 10, 2019
13 13 order Generic Order Mon 06/10 5:49 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 6/10/2019 Related [+] (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 06/10 5:50 PM
Workers' Compensation Fund Answer Deadline Reset for 8/10/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 06/07 10:30 AM
Stipulation By Workers' Compensation Fund and. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Workers' Compensation Fund ) Related [+] (Flores, Henry)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/15 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Order
Friday, May 10, 2019
10 10 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 6:12 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 5/10/2019 Related [+] (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Monday, May 06, 2019
9 9 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/06 10:46 AM
Proposed Order RE: Stipulation (Filed By Workers' Compensation Fund ) Related [+] (Flores, Henry)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 05/06 10:38 AM
Stipulation By Workers' Compensation Fund and Plaintiff. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Workers' Compensation Fund ) Related [+] (Flores, Henry)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/10 4:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Workers' Compensation Fund 4/10/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 12:10 PM
Summons Issued on Workers' Compensation Fund Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 7:53 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Workers' Compensation Fund. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate Mon 04/08 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Saturday, April 06, 2019
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/07 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Thursday, April 04, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Thu 04/04 2:49 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 04/03 1:16 PM
Adversary case 19-03386 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against Workers' Compensation Fund. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A