Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03389
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2019
Terminated:Nov 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
UPS Supply Chain Solutions
Represented By
UPS Supply Chain Solutions
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, November 22, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/22 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
24 24 order Dismissing Adversary Case Wed 11/20 9:38 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3389, Signed on 11/20/2019 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/21 2:00 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3389 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Generic Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 11/12 3:57 PM
UPS Supply Chain Solutions Answer Deadline Reset for 11/29/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2019
22 22 order Generic Order Tue 11/12 3:56 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 11/9/2019 Related [+] (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation
Monday, October 28, 2019
21 21 misc Stipulation Mon 10/28 12:10 PM
Stipulation By UPS Supply Chain Solutions and Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By UPS Supply Chain Solutions ). (Urbanik, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
20 20 court Courtroom Minutes (CM) Mon 10/21 1:45 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 am. Appearances: Andrew Layden for the Plaintiff. Hearing continued 11/20/19 at 9am, will be heard alongisde the motion to compromise. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/31 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Order
Monday, July 29, 2019
18 18 order Generic Order Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 7/29/2019 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
UPS Supply Chain Solutions Answer Deadline Reset for 10/29/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 07/24 12:25 PM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. and UPS Supply Chain Solutions. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,13 Generic Order
Sunday, June 30, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/30 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/30 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
Friday, June 28, 2019
14 14 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/28 5:06 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+]. Erica Richards added for UPS Supply Chain Solutions Signed on 6/28/2019. (hcar)
Related: [-] 12
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 06/28 10:59 AM
UPS Supply Chain Solutions Answer Deadline Reset for 7/24/2019. (kpico)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
13 13 order Generic Order Fri 06/28 10:58 AM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Signed on 6/27/2019 Related [+] (kpico)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/27 4:20 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Erica Richards . Filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions (Urbanik, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 06/25 4:08 PM
Stipulation By UPS Supply Chain Solutions and Plaintiff, Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By UPS Supply Chain Solutions ). (Urbanik, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A
Thursday, June 20, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/20 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
9 9 order Generic Order Tue 06/18 4:41 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Signed on 6/18/2019 Related [+] (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
utility Update Objection/Response Deadline Tue 06/18 4:42 PM
Deft. Response Deadline Updated Related [+] Responses due by 6/24/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 06/04 8:00 AM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. and UPS Supply Chain Solutions. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/10 4:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on UPS Supply Chain Solutions 4/10/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 12:29 PM
Summons Issued on UPS Supply Chain Solutions Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 7:54 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on UPS Supply Chain Solutions. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate Mon 04/08 2:22 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Saturday, April 06, 2019
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/07 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Thursday, April 04, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Thu 04/04 2:49 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 04/03 1:53 PM
Adversary case 19-03389 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 by Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against UPS Supply Chain Solutions. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A