Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03400
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2019
Terminated:Feb 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.
621 NW 53rd Street, Ste. 240
Boca Raton, FL 33487
Represented By
NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 05, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/05 7:57 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3400 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
35 35 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/02 2:58 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/12 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion to Abate
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
33 33 order Abate Wed 12/09 3:06 PM
Order Abating Case Related [+] Signed on 12/9/2020. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 32
Friday, October 30, 2020
32 32 motion Abate Fri 10/30 1:54 PM
Amended Motion to Abate. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Att: 2 Proposed Order
31 31 motion Abate Fri 10/30 1:20 PM
Agreed Motion to Abate. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, July 04, 2020
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/04 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, July 02, 2020
29 29 order Extend Time Thu 07/02 10:33 AM
Order Modifying Schedule and Dates Related [+] Signed on 7/2/2020. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 27
utility Update Other Deadlines Thu 07/02 10:35 AM
Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 1/4/2021. Discovery due by 8/19/2020. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 25 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
court Hearing Cont Thu 07/02 10:36 AM
Hearing Reset Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 25 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
28 28 misc Proposed Order Wed 07/01 5:23 PM
Proposed Order RE: Motion to Extend Time (Filed By NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. ) Related [+] (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
27 27 motion Extend Time Tue 06/23 7:35 PM
Motion to Extend Time [Unopposed Motion for Extention of Time to Complete Discovery] Filed by NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, November 24, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/24 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Friday, November 22, 2019
25 25 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Fri 11/22 11:23 AM
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 11/22/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 10/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/25/2020. (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Fri 11/22 11:25 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30 am. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero for Plaintiff. Nick OKelly (by phone) for Defendant. Discovery deadlines given to parties on the record. Scheduling order to be issued. Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 4:45 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
Monday, October 21, 2019
23 23 court Courtroom Minutes (CM) Mon 10/21 1:55 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 am. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero and Carolyn Carollo for Plaintiff. No appearances for Defendant, Defendant counsel to amend answer by 11/12/19, hearing continued to 11/22/19 at 9:30 am. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Monday, October 14, 2019
22 22 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Mon 10/14 9:48 AM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/10 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Generic Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 10/08 8:25 AM
Order Granting Mark Shapiro, Trustee of Alliance Health Liquidating Trust's Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
19 19 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 09/11 10:39 AM
Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
18 18 notice Notice Tue 08/20 2:53 PM
Notice of Withdraw of Counsel, Appearance of Counsel, and Request for Notices . Filed by NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/11 1:08 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. (Will, Clark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 05, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/05 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Generic Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
15 15 order Generic Order Wed 07/03 3:24 PM
Order Denying Stipulation Related [+] Signed on 7/3/2019 (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 07/02 2:09 PM
Stipulation By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC and Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC and NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc... Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/21 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Generic Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
12 12 order Generic Order Tue 06/18 9:11 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Signed on 6/18/2019 (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 06/18 9:12 PM
NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/10/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Wed 06/12 12:19 PM
Stipulation By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC and NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,9 Generic Order
Sunday, May 12, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Friday, May 10, 2019
9 9 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 3:54 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, Signed on 5/10/2019 Related [+] (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Thursday, May 09, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/09 5:39 PM
Stipulation By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC and NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 06, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate Mon 05/06 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Sunday, April 21, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Friday, April 19, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Fri 04/19 11:19 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/10 4:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. 4/10/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 12:27 PM
Summons Issued on NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc. Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 1:11 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 04/04 4:53 PM
Adversary case 19-03400 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC against NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A