Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03422
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:Oct 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ernest Packaging Solutions
Represented By
Ernest Packaging Solutions
contact info
Plaintiff
New Life Pharmacy, LLC
9883 S. 500 W
Sandy, UT 84070
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/10 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
11 11 order Default Judgment Mon 10/07 5:42 PM
Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 10/07 3:35 PM
Order Granting Mark Shapiro, Trustee of Alliance Health Liquidating Trusts Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 8
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/07 5:42 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3422 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/13 3:43 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Issued Summons
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Executed Summons
Att: 4 Default Judgment
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
8 8 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 09/11 11:39 AM
Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 06, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate Mon 05/06 1:13 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., New Life Pharmacy, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Sunday, April 21, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Friday, April 19, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Fri 04/19 11:19 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/11 1:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ernest Packaging Solutions 4/11/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 3:51 PM
Summons Issued on Ernest Packaging Solutions Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 1:25 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Ernest Packaging Solutions. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 04/05 8:28 AM
Adversary case 19-03422 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by New Life Pharmacy, LLC, Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against Ernest Packaging Solutions. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A