Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03427
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:Jun 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
ADT Security Services, Inc.
Represented By
ADT Security Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald L Glass
GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC 3445 Peachtree Rd Ste 1225
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
Ronald L Glass
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, June 21, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/21 12:23 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3427 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/18 2:47 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Ronald L Glass (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/16 9:17 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on ADT Security Services, Inc. 5/16/2019. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Summons Issued Thu 05/16 8:34 AM
Summons Issued on ADT Security Services, Inc. Date Issued 5/16/2019. (SarahShelby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
8 8 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 05/15 3:28 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on ADT Security Services, Inc.. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Friday, April 19, 2019
6 6 misc Certificate Fri 04/19 1:12 PM
Certificate of Service Order Setting Rule 7016 Conference, Requiring Rule 7026 Meeting, Establishing Procedures for Discovery Disputes, and Emphasizing Applicability of Certain Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as Made Applicable by the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Ronald L Glass ) Related [+] (Cimo, David)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Fri 04/19 11:19 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/19 9:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on ADT Security Services, Inc. 4/19/2019. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/19 8:23 AM
Summons Issued on ADT Security Services, Inc. Date Issued 4/19/2019. (SarahShelby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 04/18 4:00 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on ADT Security Services, Inc.. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Ronald L Glass ). (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 04/05 11:10 AM
Adversary case 19-03427 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 548 AND 550 by Ronald L Glass, Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against ADT Security Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Cimo, David)
Related: [-]