Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-32186

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03433
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:Feb 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Represented By
Anda, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Innovative Rx, LLC
12176 S. 1000 E Suite 2
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Geneva Pharmacy, LLC
20513 Nicholas Circle Suite 3
Elkhorn, NE 68022
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richardson Pharmacy, LLC
1300 East Arapaho Road Suite 210
Richardson, TX 75081
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benson Pharmacy, Inc.
18005 Sky Park Circle Suite E
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendall Pharmacy, Inc.
1555 Doolittle Drive Suite 160
San Leandro, CA 94577
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charleston Rx, LLC
2498 North Pleasantburg Drive
Greenville, SC 29609
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohana Rx, LLC
4416 Dewey Avenue
Greece, NY 14616
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Waverly Pharmacy, LLC
328 W. Main Street
Waverly, VA 23890
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BrooksideRx, LLC
11020 Q Street
Omaha, NE 68137
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lone Peak Rx, LLC
11724 S. State Street Suite 102
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Skyline Health Services, LLC
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 South Riverfront Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A Green
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/03 10:07 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3433 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
46 46 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/31 10:43 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Fri 11/22 11:37 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30 am. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero for Plaintiff. No appearances for Defendant. Parties have filed a notice of stipulated settlement. Abated until 1/31/19. Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference,28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, November 15, 2019
45 45 notice Notice Fri 11/15 8:33 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement . Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2019
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/02 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Thursday, October 31, 2019
43 43 order Continue Hearing Thu 10/31 12:24 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Continue Motion to Dismiss and Pretrial Conference Scheduled for November 4, 2019 Related [+], Signed on 10/31/2019. Hearings scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 42
42 42 motion Continue Hearing Thu 10/31 10:52 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+]. Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,39 Generic Order
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 17, 2019
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/17 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Generic Order
40 40 notice Notice Thu 10/17 3:07 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Pre-Trial Conference . Related [+] Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] Hearing (Bk)
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 10/15 3:08 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference Scheduled for October 21, 2019 Related [+] Signed on 10/15/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 34
court Hearing Set Tue 10/15 3:17 PM
Pretrial conference continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Generic Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 10/07 3:58 PM
Order Granting Mark Shapiro, Trustee of Alliance Health Liquidating Trusts Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 31
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
36 36 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Wed 10/02 9:15 AM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
35 35 notice Notice Tue 10/01 3:44 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] Hearing (Bk) Cont
34 34 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 10/01 10:47 AM
Agreed Motion To Continue Pretrial Conference Scheduled for October 21, 2019 (Doc. No. 5) Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
court Hearing Cont Wed 09/18 4:40 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing rescheduled for 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
33 33 motion Continue Hearing Tue 09/17 3:27 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+]. Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
32 32 answer Response Tue 09/17 12:18 PM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Carollo, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
31 31 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 09/11 11:51 AM
Motion for Substitution as Plaintiff Filed by Mark Shapiro, Liquidating Trustee of the Alliance Health Liquidating Trust (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
30 30 notice Notice Tue 08/27 12:08 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Hearing (Bk) Cont
29 29 notice Notice Tue 08/27 10:48 AM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
28 28 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/27 10:09 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Anda, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/20/2019 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Cont Tue 08/27 11:38 AM
Hearing Reset Related [+] This motion was incorrectly self-calendared on a date not available or authorized by the Court. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing rescheduled for 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Sunday, August 18, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/18 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Generic Order
Friday, August 16, 2019
26 26 order Generic Order Fri 08/16 3:27 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Amended Complaint Related [+] Signed on 8/16/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 25 Proposed Order
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 08/27 11:58 AM
Anda, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 8/27/2019. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
25 25 misc Proposed Order Mon 08/12 7:34 AM
Proposed Order RE: Extending Time For Defendant to Respond to The Amended Complaint (Filed By Anda, Inc. ) Related [+] (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulation
24 24 misc Stipulation Mon 08/12 7:31 AM
Stipulation By Anda, Inc. and Plaintiffs. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Anda, Inc. ). (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
23 23 misc Withdraw Document Thu 08/01 11:22 AM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Anda, Inc. ) Related [+] (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/30 2:53 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
21 21 notice Notice Tue 07/09 3:23 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Anda, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
20 20 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/09 2:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Anda, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/21 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 06/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
18 18 order Generic Order Tue 06/18 9:40 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Signed on 6/18/2019 (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 06/18 9:41 PM
Anda, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/10/2019. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 06/07 9:33 AM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Benson Pharmacy, Inc., BrooksideRx, LLC, Charleston Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Innovative Rx, LLC, Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC and Anda, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Benson Pharmacy, Inc., BrooksideRx, LLC, Charleston Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Innovative Rx, LLC, Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 15 Generic Order
Sunday, May 12, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Generic Order
Friday, May 10, 2019
15 15 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 3:10 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Signed on 5/10/2019 (sgue)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 05/10 3:11 PM
Anda, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 6/10/2019. (sgue)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 05/07 1:38 PM
Stipulation By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Benson Pharmacy, Inc., BrooksideRx, LLC, Charleston Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Innovative Rx, LLC, Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC and Anda, Inc.. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Benson Pharmacy, Inc., BrooksideRx, LLC, Charleston Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Innovative Rx, LLC, Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 06, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate Mon 05/06 9:04 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Alliance Medical Administration, Inc., Benson Pharmacy, Inc., BrooksideRx, LLC, Charleston Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Innovative Rx, LLC, Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC ) Related [+] (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Thursday, April 25, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/25 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 04/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/24 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/23 1:47 PM
Order Granting Megan W. Murray To Appear pro hac vice, Signed on 4/23/2019 Related [+]. (rcas)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/23 1:45 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Megan W. Murray . Filed by Anda, Inc. (rcas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/22 12:02 PM
Order Granting John D. Emmanuel to Appear pro hac vice, Signed on 4/22/2019 Related [+]. (rcas)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/22 12:00 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice ,John D. Emmanuel . Filed by Defendant Anda, Inc. (rcas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 04/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Conference
Friday, April 19, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Fri 04/19 11:19 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/11 1:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Anda, Inc. 4/11/2019. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 04/10 4:00 PM
Summons Issued on Anda, Inc. Date Issued 4/10/2019. (JesusGuajardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 04/09 4:45 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Anda, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 04/05 4:38 PM
Adversary case 19-03433 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502 by Innovative Rx, LLC, Geneva Pharmacy, LLC, Richardson Pharmacy, LLC, Benson Pharmacy, Inc., Kendall Pharmacy, Inc., Charleston Rx, LLC, Ohana Rx, LLC, Waverly Pharmacy, LLC, BrooksideRx, LLC, Lone Peak Rx, LLC, Skyline Health Services, LLC, Alliance Medical Administration, Inc. against Anda, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Green, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B