Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00037
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2019
Terminated:Jul 02, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Navajo Express, Inc.
400 West 64th Avenue
Denver, CO 80221
Represented By
Navajo Express, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
15 15 court Writ Issued Tue 08/31 3:18 PM
Issued Writ of Execution. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
14 14 court Bill of Costs Wed 11/20 3:36 PM
Bill of Costs Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, November 14, 2019
admis Request for Certification of Judgment (Text) Thu 11/14 10:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District (Fee 11) filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 11/14 10:24 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Request for Clerk to Issue Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District([LINK 19-00037 5-SWH] ) [admis,certjud] ( 11.00), Receipt Number A15166827, Amount $ 11.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/02 11:23 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-37 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
13 13 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Tue 06/25 2:52 PM
Bill of Costs filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 06/20 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/19/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, June 17, 2019
11 11 order Default Judgment Mon 06/17 3:14 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Navajo Express, Inc. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, June 13, 2019
10 10 18 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Thu 06/13 4:59 PM
Memorandum of Law filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Navajo Express, Inc.
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 06/13 4:56 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Navajo Express, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 25, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 05/26 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/25/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, May 23, 2019
7 7 court Entry of Default Thu 05/23 9:54 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Monday, May 20, 2019
6 6 motion Entry of Default Mon 05/20 11:21 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Navajo Express, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 05/18 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/17/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Wed 05/15 7:17 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 6/6/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Mon 04/15 4:04 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Thursday, April 11, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Thu 04/11 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/10/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
Summons Issued on Navajo Express, Inc. Answer Due 05/10/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
Adversary case 19-00037 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Navajo Express, Inc. (Fee Paid) (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E