Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00038
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2019
Terminated:Aug 15, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
England Logistics, Inc.
1325 East South Union Avenue
Midvale, UT 84047
Represented By
England Logistics, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2019
10 10 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Thu 08/15 1:59 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 5:19-ap-38 closed . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 1:49 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
8 8 order Compromise Wed 07/10 12:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, June 14, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Fri 06/14 11:30 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Approve Compromise With England Logistics, Inc.
6 6 motion Compromise Fri 06/14 11:20 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With England Logistics, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 05/08 12:55 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to File Answer filed by Joseph Zachary Frost, Algernon L. Butler III on behalf of England Logistics, Inc.. (Butler, Algernon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
4 4 court Corrected PDF Attachment Thu 04/18 12:23 PM
Corrected PDF Attachment Related [+] filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3 Affidavit filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.3 Affidavit
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Wed 04/17 3:04 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Friday, April 12, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Fri 04/12 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/13/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/11 9:58 AM
Summons Issued on England Logistics, Inc. Answer Due 05/13/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/11 9:58 AM
Adversary case 19-00038 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Plan Trustee for Wayne Bailey, Inc., Wayne Bailey, Inc. against England Logistics, Inc. (Fee Paid) (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C-A
Att: 4 Exhibit C-2
Att: 5 Exhibit C-3
Att: 6 Exhibit C-4
Att: 7 Exhibit C-5
Att: 8 Exhibit C-6
Att: 9 Exhibit C-7
Att: 10 Exhibit D