Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-41813

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-ap-01046
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:Jun 06, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eurowage Limited
Represented By
Eurowage Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Duval
Represented By
Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Lamonica Herbst Maniscalco
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Thursday, June 06, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/06 3:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1046 Closed (rjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/09 10:10 AM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate. (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
6 6 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 05/07 10:13 AM
Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against Eurowage Limited Answer Due 6/6/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 misc Letter Thu 05/02 11:06 AM
Letter requesting the issuance of a second supplemental summons Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, April 19, 2019
4 4 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 04/19 10:40 AM
Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against Eurowage Limited Answer Due 5/20/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella Only) (Auto) Fri 04/19 10:38 AM
(Disregard, no document attached) Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Eurowage Limited Answer Due 5/20/2019 (rjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Eurowage Limited Answer Due: 5/16/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
Adversary case 1 19-01046 Complaint by Esther Duval against Eurowage Limited. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet