New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:17-bk-41813
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Jun 23, 2021
Converted:Mar 12, 2021
Terminated:Sep 06, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 09, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Avenica Inc.
5068 44th St
Woodside, NY 11377-7320
Represented By
Cristina Mihaela Lipan
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
IRENE Marie COSTELLO
contact info
Debtor
Gallant Capital Markets
5068 44th St
Woodside, NY 11377
Represented By
IRENE Marie COSTELLO
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Esther DuVal
5 Bryant Park
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Lamonica Herbst Maniscalco
contact info
Robert M Schechter
Porzio Bromberg & Newman PC
contact info
John S Mairo
Porzio Bromberg & Newman PC
contact info
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Gary F. Herbst
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Trustee
Robert J Musso
26 Court Street Suite 2211
Brooklyn, NY 11242
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Rachel Wolf
Office of the United States Trustee Brooklyn Office U.S Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street , Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 07/25/2022 9:09 AM EDT
Friday, April 14, 2017
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 04/14 5:05 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 17-41813 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15345696. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/14 5:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Irene Marie Costello on behalf of Avenica Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/14/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 08/14/2017. (Costello, Irene)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Fri 04/14 5:47 PM
Statement Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 1074-1(a) Filed by Irene Marie Costello on behalf of Avenica Inc. (Costello, Irene)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Mon 04/17 3:14 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 - Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/14/2017. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/14/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/14/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/28/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/28/2017. Schedule A/B due 4/28/2017. Schedule D due 4/28/2017. Schedule E/F due 4/28/2017. Schedule G due 4/28/2017. Schedule H due 4/28/2017. Schedule I due 4/28/2017. Schedule J due 4/28/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/28/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/28/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/28/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 4/28/2017. (ads)
Related: [-]