Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-41813

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-ap-01050
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:Jan 11, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scope Markets, Ltd.
Represented By
Scope Markets, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Duval
Represented By
Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Lamonica Herbst Maniscalco
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, January 11, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/11 3:20 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1050 Closed (ads)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Wed 12/02 7:36 AM
Stipulation and Order by and between the Plaintiff and the Defendant Resolving the Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 12/1/2020 (sem)
Related: [-] 9
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Thu 12/03 8:46 AM
Hearing Held- Appearance by Defendant - No Appearance by Defendant - Related [+] Settled - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 12/1/2020 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) Submit Stipulation and Order (sej)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 13, 2020
10 10 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 11/13 2:23 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Thursday, November 12, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Thu 11/12 4:06 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Plaintiff and Defendant to Resolve the Adversary Proceeding. To Be Presented on November 30, 2020 with Objections Due by November 23, 2020 Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate.(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation and Order
Monday, November 02, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 11/02 3:44 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff; No Appearance by Defendant; Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/01/2020 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto),1 Complaint
Thursday, October 15, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 10/16 4:34 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by UST; Appearance by Plaintiff; No Appearance by Defendant; Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/02/2020 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 13, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 08/14 8:37 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff; No Appearance by Defendant; Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/17 8:17 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] - Appearance by Plaintiff - No Appearance by Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/13/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 04/14 8:01 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto),8 Letter of Adjournment filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Thursday, April 09, 2020
8 8 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 04/09 1:36 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from April 14, 2020 at 9:30 am to June 16, 2020 at 10:00 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 07, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 02/10 4:39 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/14/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto),7 Letter of Adjournment filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
7 7 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 02/04 5:03 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from February 7, 2020 at 10:00 am to April 14, 2020 at 9:30 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, January 03, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Fri 01/03 8:46 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/07/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Thursday, January 02, 2020
6 6 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 01/02 2:55 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from January 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to February 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Holecek, Holly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, November 15, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 11/15 9:16 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] - Appearance by Plaintiff - No Appearance by Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/03/2020 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Thursday, October 24, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 10/28 7:59 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
5 5 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 10/23 12:03 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from October 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to November 15, 2019 at 9:30 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 06, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Fri 09/06 4:56 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Thursday, September 05, 2019
4 4 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 09/05 4:00 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 6, 2019 at 10:30 am to October 24, 2019 at 10:00 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 01, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Thu 08/01 3:21 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 09/06/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Thursday, July 18, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Thu 07/18 8:04 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/01/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 07/02 8:35 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance by UST - Appearance by Plaintiff - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/18/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/12 6:58 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance by Plaintiff - No appearance by Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/02/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Friday, April 19, 2019
3 3 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 04/19 10:32 AM
Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against Scope Markets, Ltd. Answer Due 5/20/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 04/16 3:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Scope Markets, Ltd. Answer Due: 5/16/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 2:41 PM
Adversary case 1 19-01050 Complaint by Esther Duval against Scope Markets, Ltd.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet