Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-41813

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-ap-01052
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:Sep 25, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
WSM Invest Limited
Represented By
WSM Invest Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Duval, solely in her capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Represented By
Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Lamonica Herbst Maniscalco
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
26 26 misc Statement Wed 07/27 2:34 PM
Assignment of Judgment from Ronald J. Friedman to SM Financial Services Corporation Filed by Steven Mitnick, Esq (drk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/25 9:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1052 Closed (ads)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
25 25 order Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11) Tue 08/04 12:35 PM
Judgment. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff has a judgment against WSM Invest Limited, an address at 11 Matakana Valley Road Level 2, Rd5, 0985 Warkworth, New Zealand in the amount of $150,000.00, plus interest at the Federal Rate from April 12, 2019 and costs of $350; and it is furtherORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff shall have execution hereon; and it is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff shall have all of the rights and remedies afforded under the law to a judgment creditor; and it is furtherORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff may enforce the Judgment against the Defendant as allowed under applicable law; and it is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff may do such things, expend such funds and execute such documents as may be necessary to enforce this Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 8/4/2020 (sem)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, August 03, 2020
24 24 order Default Judgment Mon 08/03 2:19 PM
Order that the Plaintiff Esther DuVal, as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Estate of Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. be awarded a default judgment against defendant WSM Invest Limited in the amount of $150,000.00, plus interest at the Federal Rate from April 12, 2019 and costs of $350 Related [+] Signed on 8/3/2020. (aac)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
23 23 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 06/24 12:13 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Monday, June 22, 2020
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Mon 06/22 3:49 PM
Amended Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for July 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+].(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 18 19 20 21
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Default Judgment
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Mon 06/22 3:35 PM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for July 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+].(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 18 ,20 ,19
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Default Judgment
Friday, June 19, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Fri 06/19 10:11 AM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for June 30, 2020 Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+].(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 proposed order
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, June 18, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Thu 06/18 5:07 PM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for June 30, 2020 Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate.(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Thu 06/18 4:26 PM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for June 26, 2020 Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+].(Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/17 8:17 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] - Appearance by Plaintiff - No Appearance by Defendant - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 6/16/2020 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 06/17 8:18 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] - Appearance by Plaintiff - No Appearance by Defendant - Granted - Settle order and judgment on 30 days notice (sjackson)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
17 17 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 05/12 12:00 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Monday, May 11, 2020
16 16 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/11 2:15 PM
Motion for Default Judgment /Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's motion for the entry of an Order for Default Judgment and Default Judgment against defendant pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7055 and local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1 . Objections to be filed on 6/9/2020. Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation in support of plainitiff's motion for default judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Transfer
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Revised Summons and Proof of Service
Att: 5 Exhibit D- current docket sheet
Att: 6 Exhibit Proposed Order
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 04/14 8:01 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),15 Letter of Adjournment filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Thursday, April 09, 2020
15 15 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 04/09 1:37 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from April 14, 2020 at 9:30 am to June 16, 2020 at 10:00 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 07, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 02/10 4:39 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/14/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),14 Letter of Adjournment filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
14 14 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 02/04 5:05 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from February 7, 2020 at 10:00 am to April 14, 2020 at 9:30 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, January 03, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Fri 01/03 8:47 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/07/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, January 02, 2020
13 13 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 01/02 2:56 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from January 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to February 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Holecek, Holly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, November 15, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 11/15 9:17 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] - Appearance by Plaintiff - No Appearance by Defendant - Note default on the record - Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/03/2020 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, October 24, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 10/28 8:00 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
12 12 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 10/23 12:04 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from October 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to November 15, 2019 at 9:30 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 06, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Fri 09/06 4:57 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, September 05, 2019
11 11 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 09/05 4:02 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 6, 2019 at 10:30 am to October 24, 2019 at 10:00 am Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/04 2:42 PM
Summons Served on WSM Invest Limited 7/3/2019 . (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Thu 08/01 3:22 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/06/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, July 18, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Thu 07/18 8:05 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/01/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 07/02 8:35 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance by UST - Appearance by Plaintiff - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/18/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Saturday, June 22, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sun 06/23 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 06/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
8 8 order Generic Order Thu 06/20 8:28 AM
Order Authorizing Service of the revised Summons on the Defendant in the above-captioned Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 6/19/2019 (ads)
Related: [-] 7 Letter filed by Plaintiff Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/12 7:00 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance by Plaintiff - No appearance by Defendant - Submit order as reflected in the record - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/02/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
7 7 misc Letter Wed 05/15 3:46 PM
Letter Seeking the Court's Authority to Serve the Proposed Revised Summons Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Revised Summons
6 6 misc Letter Wed 05/15 3:42 PM
Letter Seeking the Court's Authority to Serve the Proposed Revised Summons Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Revised Summons
Monday, May 06, 2019
5 5 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 05/06 2:08 PM
Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against WSM Invest Limited Answer Due 6/5/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (ads)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
4 4 misc Letter Thu 05/02 11:00 AM
Letter requesting the issuance of a supplemental summons Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 15, 2019
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 04/16 2:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against WSM Invest Limited Answer Due: 5/15/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (dkc)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Mon 04/15 3:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against WSM Invest Limited Answer Due: 5/15/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (dkc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
Adversary case 1 19-01052 Complaint by Esther Duval against WSM Invest Limited. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet