Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-41813

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-ap-01054
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:Jan 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
GKR Consulting LLC
Represented By
GKR Consulting LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Duval
Represented By
Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Lamonica Herbst Maniscalco
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, January 02, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/02 4:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1054 Closed (aac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
10 10 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/02 9:24 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. Signed on 10/1/2019 (aac)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Tue 07/02 8:39 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance by UST - Appearance by Plaintiff - No appearance by Defendant - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 7/2/19. (This is a text Order, no document is attached)(sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),3 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto),9 Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate
Monday, July 01, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/01 12:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate. (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
8 8 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 06/17 9:39 AM
Stipulation and Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the Time for Defendant GKR Consulting LLC to File an Answer or to respond to the Complaint. The Defendant waives any defense based on insufficiency of service of process or lack of personal jurisdiction in this adversary proceeding. Answer Due 7/15/2019. Signed on 6/14/2019 (aac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 06/12 5:11 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend the Defendant's Time to Answer Filed by Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate. (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/12 7:01 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance by Plaintiff - No appearance by Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/02/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Esther Duval
Thursday, May 30, 2019
6 6 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 06/03 9:18 AM
Stipulation and Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the Time for Defendant GKR Consulting LLC to File an Answer or to respond to the Complaint. Answer Due 6/14/2019. Signed on 5/30/2019 (aac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
5 5 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Thu 05/09 4:08 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Esther DuVal, solely in her capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. Estate, and Defendant GKR Consulting LLC to extend the time for Defendant to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Jacqulyn Somers Loftin on behalf of Esther Duval, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of the Gallant Capital Markets, Ltd. estate Related [+] (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
Monday, April 22, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/22 11:57 AM
Supplemental Summons Served on GKR Consulting LLC 4/22/2019 with Complaint . (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
3 3 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 04/19 10:43 AM
Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against GKR Consulting LLC Answer Due 5/20/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 04/16 3:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against GKR Consulting LLC Answer Due: 5/16/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (rjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 3:03 PM
Adversary case 1 19-01054 Complaint by Esther Duval against GKR Consulting LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet