Adler v. Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.
3867 Plaza Tower Dr.
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PrimeFlight Aviation (Delaware Corporation)
Cogency Global Inc. 850 New Burton Road Suite 201
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Adler
Post Office Box 55129
Metairie, LA 70055 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/23 4:21 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1074. (McGinn, S) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Fri 07/12 10:24 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by David V. Adler |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Mon 07/08 2:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on July 8, 2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Fri 06/28 2:48 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by David V. Adler (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Compromise (Order)
Wed 06/05 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise with Primeflight Aviation IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 6/5/19. (Lew, K) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Compromise (Motion) (AP)
Wed 05/08 4:19 PM
Motion to Compromise PrimeFlight Aviation Claim Filed by David V. Adler (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on PrimeFlight Aviation (Delaware Corporation) 4/17/2019 . (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. 4/17/2019 . (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Wed 04/17 2:19 PM
Summons Issued on PrimeFlight Aviation (Delaware Corporation) Answer Due 5/17/2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Wed 04/17 2:18 PM
Summons Issued on Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. Answer Due 5/17/2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:29 PM
Adversary case 19-01074 Complaint by David V. Adler against Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., PrimeFlight Aviation (Delaware Corporation). Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Laudumiey, Fernand) |