Adler v. ACSTAR Insurance Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01076 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ACSTAR Insurance Company
8585 Archives Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70809 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Adler
Post Office Box 55129
Metairie, LA 70055 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/10 3:39 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1076. (McGinn, S) |
||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Fri 09/13 4:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on September 13, 2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Fri 09/13 2:10 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by David V. Adler (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Compromise (Order)
Tue 07/16 2:54 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on July 15, 2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Compromise (Motion) (AP)
Thu 06/06 10:20 AM
Motion to Compromise ACSTAR Claim Filed by David V. Adler (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on ACSTAR Insurance Company 4/18/2019 . (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 04/18 3:45 PM
Summons Issued on ACSTAR Insurance Company Answer Due 5/20/2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:01 PM
Adversary case 19-01076 Complaint by David V. Adler against ACSTAR Insurance Company. Fee Amount $350. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Laudumiey, Fernand) |